TN HB2483 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the administrative office of the courts to create standards of practice for guardians and conservators; declares that it is the policy of this state that guardians and conservators must abide by the highest ethical standards of decision-making when making decisions for their wards or protected persons. - Amends TCA Title 34 and Title 71, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 34 and Title 71, Chapter 2, relative to conservatorships and guardianships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2442 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee