TN HB2477 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the family life curriculum adopted by the state board of education or an LEA include information on the prevention of dating violence. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, requires that the family life curriculum adopted by the state board of education or an LEA include information on the prevention of dating violence. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] |
Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 736 | |
2020-06-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2269 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 736