TN HB2466 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Ricky Otts Act" which requires an officer to arrest drivers involved in accidents resulting in serious bodily injury or death when such drivers lack a valid driver license and evidence of financial responsibility; prohibits the issuance of a citation in lieu of arrest in such circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 55, Chapter 10; Title 55, Chapter 12; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Ricky Otts Act" which requires an officer to arrest drivers involved in accidents resulting in serious bodily injury or death when such drivers lack a valid driver license and evidence of financial responsibility; prohibits the issuance of a citation in lieu of arrest in such circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 55, Chapter 10; Title 55, Chapter 12; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 737 | |
2012-04-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-04 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-02 | Passed S., Ayes 21, Nays 10 | |
2012-04-02 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-02 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-02 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-02 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 | |
2012-04-02 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0680) | |
2012-04-02 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0679) | |
2012-03-15 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2350 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 737