TN HB2460 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education, in consultation with the department of human services, to provide a report to the education committees of the house of representatives and senate that explains the benefits of community-based early childhood education and pre-kindergarten programs on the students and LEAs. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education, in consultation with the department of human services, to provide a report to the education committees of the house of representatives and senate that explains the benefits of community-based early childhood education and pre-kindergarten programs on the students and LEAs. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2503 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2460&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2460.pdf |