TN HB2439 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes any local government in this state to create a land bank; authorizes a local government to post on its website, if available, a link to a state website or publication identifying surplus real property for sale or conveyance. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12, Chapter 2 and Title 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12, Chapter 2 and Title 13, relative to local governments.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2239 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee