TN HB2428 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a law enforcement officer to transport any juvenile taken into custody to a juvenile assessment center, unless the child is in custody for certain offenses. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a law enforcement officer to transport any juvenile taken into custody to a juvenile assessment center, unless the child is in custody for certain offenses. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2624 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee