TN HB2425 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 903
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 903
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, lowers the age for receiving a handgun carry permit from 21 years of age to 18 years of age for persons who are an honorably discharged or retired veteran of the U.S. armed forces or a service member on active duty status. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As enacted, lowers the age for receiving a handgun carry permit from 21 years of age to 18 years of age for persons who are an honorably discharged or retired veteran of the U.S. armed forces or a service member on active duty status. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 903 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016; 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0953) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0937) |
2016-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2238 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 903