TN SB2238 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 903
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 903
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, lowers the age for receiving a handgun carry permit from 21 years of age to 18 years of age for persons who are an honorably discharged or retired veteran of the U.S. armed forces or a service member on active duty status. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As enacted, lowers the age for receiving a handgun carry permit from 21 years of age to 18 years of age for persons who are an honorably discharged or retired veteran of the U.S. armed forces or a service member on active duty status. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 903 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Voice Vote Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Voice Vote Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2425 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 903