TN HB2414 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires students in public schools and public institutions of higher education to use restrooms and locker rooms that are assigned to persons of the same sex as that shown on the students' birth certificates. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires students in public schools and public institutions of higher education to use restrooms and locker rooms that are assigned to persons of the same sex as that shown on the students' birth certificates. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
2016-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2016
2016-04-08HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2016-04-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-03-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/5/2016
2016-03-22HouseDef. to Summer Study
2016-03-21HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/22/2016
2016-03-15HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2016-03-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
2016-03-08HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/15/2016
2016-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-02HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
2016-03-01HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/8/2016
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
2016-02-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2016-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2016-01-25HouseP1C.
2016-01-21HouseIntro.
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2387 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2016

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback