TN HB2397 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau of TennCare to report on the number of individuals receiving care for which hospitals receive funding from demonstration supplemental payment and uncompensated care pools established through the TennCare II waiver; requires that the report be delivered to the health committee of the house of representatives and the senate health and welfare committee no later than January 15, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the bureau of TennCare to report on the number of individuals receiving care for which hospitals receive funding from demonstration supplemental payment and uncompensated care pools established through the TennCare II waiver; requires that the report be delivered to the health committee of the house of representatives and the senate health and welfare committee no later than January 15, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2274 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee