TN HB2397 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes obsolete chapters; increases amount of wine that person may purchase through licensed direct shipper from one case a month to two cases a month. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, removes obsolete chapters; increases amount of wine that person may purchase through licensed direct shipper from one case a month to two cases a month. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2349 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2397&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2397.pdf |