TN HB2394 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the reduced registration fee of $1.25 to motor vehicles operated by governmental units as bailee or lessee in addition to motor vehicles owned and operated by governmental units or private or volunteer fire department units exclusively used for governmental and fire protection purposes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, extends the reduced registration fee of $1.25 to motor vehicles operated by governmental units as bailee or lessee in addition to motor vehicles owned and operated by governmental units or private or volunteer fire department units exclusively used for governmental and fire protection purposes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2256 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-29 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2394&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2394.pdf |