TN HB2393 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the fees collected by the commission from Tennessee SARA institutions pursuant to the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7, relative to fees for state authorization reciprocity agreement institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration- Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2826 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for action.