TN HB2392 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing "base tax revenues" under the Convention Center and Tourism Development Financing Act of 1998. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8, relative to local government.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1029 | |
2022-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2022-04-05 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2128 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022