TN HB2388 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Failed in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Failed in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, broadens, from only Madison County to statewide, the authority to recall a local board of education member. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 31, Part 3 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6, Chapter 31, Part 3 and Title 49, relative to local school board members.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Failed in Education Administration |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2596 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee