TN HB2384 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state treasurer to develop, implement, and administer a program to award grants to eligible employers for the purpose of funding of a length of service award program. - Amends TCA Section 8-25-115.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 8-25-115, relative to a length of service award program.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1113 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2342 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022