TN HB2383 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires schools to count a student present when the student visits an institution of higher education as a prospective enrollee; requires that the student not be counted as absent, either excused or unexcused; requires local boards of education to adopt policies concerning crediting students present for visits to institutions of higher education as prospective enrollees. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3018.
Title
As introduced, requires schools to count a student present when the student visits an institution of higher education as a prospective enrollee; requires that the student not be counted as absent, either excused or unexcused; requires local boards of education to adopt policies concerning crediting students present for visits to institutions of higher education as prospective enrollees. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2382 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee