TN HB2378 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the legislative librarian as a party to which the commissioner must submit an annual report on the work done by the commissioner in supervising dentists and dental equipment in the various state institutions, as well as in distributing literature throughout the state to inform the public on proper dental care. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 14; Title 29; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 14; Title 29; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0798) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0849) |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2300 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-11 - Companion House Bill substituted