TN HB2373 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires department of education in its annual report on character education to the education oversight committee to report the number of students receiving character education in the most recent year by grade level. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, requires department of education in its annual report on character education to the education oversight committee to report the number of students receiving character education in the most recent year by grade level. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2342 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-02 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2373&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2373.pdf |