TN HB2369 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes jurisdictional exceptions to prohibition on discrimination against first responders based upon residency with respect to employment; prohibits all local governments in this state from discriminating against first responders with respect to employment based on residence. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 41 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 41 and Title 68, relative to first responders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851 | |
2024-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-04 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2205 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024