TN HB2363 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the state coordinator of elections to include instructions regarding the ability of an applicant who submitted an online voter registration to check the status of the application after its submission. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the state coordinator of elections to include instructions regarding the ability of an applicant who submitted an online voter registration to check the status of the application after its submission. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0658)
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-12SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 20, PNV 1
2020-03-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0564)
2020-03-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020
2020-02-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 2/26/2020
2020-02-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2020-02-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/19/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2298 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback