TN HB2363 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Higher Education Authorization Act of 2016, and provisions regarding the Tennessee higher education commission. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Higher Education Authorization Act of 2016, and provisions regarding the Tennessee higher education commission. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790 | |
2018-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2294 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 790