TN HB2347 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that federal conservation agencies are "qualified conservation organizations" which are permitted grantees of open space easements, for purposes of classifying certain agricultural land. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-1009.
Title
As enacted, specifies that federal conservation agencies are "qualified conservation organizations" which are permitted grantees of open space easements, for purposes of classifying certain agricultural land. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-1009.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 846 |
2014-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2461 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 846