TN HB2339 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a county or city to issue permits not only to the owner of a business engaged in the sale, distribution, manufacture, or storage of beer, but also to the entity responsible for the premises for which the permit is sought. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a county or city to issue permits not only to the owner of a business engaged in the sale, distribution, manufacture, or storage of beer, but also to the entity responsible for the premises for which the permit is sought. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754 |
2014-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2489 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 754