TN HB2338 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 956
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 956
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes online education courses as a method of compliance for continuing education requirements mandated for commissioners of a municipal utility board; requires the comptroller of the treasury to offer online education courses, beginning no later than March 1, 2019, for the purposes of compliance with continuing education requirements; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Title
As enacted, authorizes online education courses as a method of compliance for continuing education requirements mandated for commissioners of a municipal utility board; requires the comptroller of the treasury to offer online education courses, beginning no later than March 1, 2019, for the purposes of compliance with continuing education requirements; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 4 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 4 by Bell (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 4 by Bell (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 956 | |
2018-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/15/2018 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 4 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2338 |
2018-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA1165) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA1108) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1107) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0780) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1104) |
2018-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0966) |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2292 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 956