TN HB2331 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a charter management organization to conduct meetings of its board of directors by electronic communication, if a physical quorum is not present at the meeting location without the determination that a necessity exists. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, allows a charter management organization to conduct meetings of its board of directors by electronic communication, if a physical quorum is not present at the meeting location without the determination that a necessity exists. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847 |
2014-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2491 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 847