TN HB2325 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 899
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 899
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, updates the compensation schedule for assistant district attorneys general, assistant public defenders, district investigators for public defenders, and criminal investigators for district attorneys to reflect the current schedule; updates the base salary for district attorneys general and public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 16.
Title
As enacted, updates the compensation schedule for assistant district attorneys general, assistant public defenders, district investigators for public defenders, and criminal investigators for district attorneys to reflect the current schedule; updates the base salary for district attorneys general and public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 899 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA1029) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0942) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0940) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA1103) |
2018-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1102) |
2018-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1071) |
2018-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0809) |
2018-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2677 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 899