TN HB2296 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board for professional counselors, marital and family therapists, and clinical pastoral therapists to enter into a reciprocal agreement with any other state that licenses marital and family therapists. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33 and Title 63, Chapter 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 33 and Title 63, Chapter 22, relative to therapists.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 700 | |
2024-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2399 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024