TN HB2281 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any person with knowledge of the death of a child to report the death immediately to the department of children's services and local law enforcement; requires the department and law enforcement agency to determine whether to initiate an investigation by child protective services based on the report. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires any person with knowledge of the death of a child to report the death immediately to the department of children's services and local law enforcement; requires the department and law enforcement agency to determine whether to initiate an investigation by child protective services based on the report. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2160 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 5 PNV 0
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2281&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2281.pdf |