TN HB2271 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018." - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018." - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] |
Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1052 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018; 07/01/2018; 07/01/2019 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Amendment #3 withdrawn. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Tabling motion lifted |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 3 HB2271 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA1160) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1025) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0905) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 6 - HA1211) |
2018-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA1207) |
2018-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1111) |
2018-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1070) |
2018-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1069) |
2018-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1068) |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Civil Justice |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2261 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1052