TN HB2269 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a civil cause of action for institutions of higher education for damages resulting from the actions of coaches and agents that result in sanctions or penalties being assessed against the institution or its athletes; creates a civil cause of action for student athletes for damages resulting from the actions of coaches, institutional agents, boosters, other student athletes and athlete agents that result in sanctions or penalties being assessed against the institution or its athletes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, creates a civil cause of action for institutions of higher education for damages resulting from the actions of coaches and agents that result in sanctions or penalties being assessed against the institution or its athletes; creates a civil cause of action for student athletes for damages resulting from the actions of coaches, institutional agents, boosters, other student athletes and athlete agents that result in sanctions or penalties being assessed against the institution or its athletes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3481 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-01 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2269&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2269.pdf |