TN HB2255 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the district attorneys general conference to file a report by February 1 of each year with the chairs of the judiciary committee of the senate and the criminal justice committee of the house of representatives detailing the number of reports of potential criminal abortions during the prior calendar year, the action taken by the appropriate district attorney general for each report, and the legal disposition of any case resulting from each report, if any. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to abortion.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |