TN HB2250 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants local legislative bodies the power to line item veto over administrative spending in a school district's proposed budget when the administrative spending exceeds 10 percent of the proposed budget. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, grants local legislative bodies the power to line item veto over administrative spending in a school district's proposed budget when the administrative spending exceeds 10 percent of the proposed budget. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Education Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee--Education |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1935 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.