TN HB2248 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions regarding required bond under the Tennessee Mineral Surface Mining Law of 1972; includes in the definition of "mineral" under the Act certain minerals on land on which any unit of state government owns the surface interests. - Amends TCA Title 59, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions regarding required bond under the Tennessee Mineral Surface Mining Law of 1972; includes in the definition of "mineral" under the Act certain minerals on land on which any unit of state government owns the surface interests. - Amends TCA Title 59, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211 | |
2009-04-30 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in Conservation & Environment Committee to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Environment of CON for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Environment of CON | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Conservation | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2294 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 211
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2248&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2248.pdf |