TN HB2245 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee automotive racing commission for the purpose of promoting and supporting the growth of the automotive racing industry in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 62.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 62, relative to the Tennessee automotive racing commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2113 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee