TN HB2216 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Danielle's Law," which extends the statute of limitations for injuries to a person, who is 18 or older, relating to sexual assault to three years or five years depending on if law enforcement was notified of the assault. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 644 | |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Reassigned to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2060 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024