TN HB2213 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits health carriers, health benefit plans, or utilization review organizations from using step therapy protocols as a basis to restrict, delay, or deny coverage for a prescription drug or drug regimen for the treatment of cancer and associated conditions if certain criteria are met. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2361 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee