TN HB2193 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the department from providing more than 24 hours' notice of a home visit if the department determines a home visit is necessary to assist in an assessment of a child and family after a report of harm to the child. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the department from providing more than 24 hours' notice of a home visit if the department determines a home visit is necessary to assist in an assessment of a child and family after a report of harm to the child. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1887 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee