TN HB2192 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that term "operating costs," for purposes of fiscal notes for bills resulting in net increase in periods of state incarceration, includes deductions for reductions in recidivism and cost savings to community. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that term "operating costs," for purposes of fiscal notes for bills resulting in net increase in periods of state incarceration, includes deductions for reductions in recidivism and cost savings to community. - Amends TCA Title 3 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Failed for Lack of Motion in: Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Finance | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1996 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-26 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2192&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2192.pdf |