TN HB2190 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from three to four the number of members the governor is authorized to appoint to an enrolling board in each county to act in lieu of the county assessor for purposes of enrolling county residents in the state militia. - Amends TCA Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, relative to the authority of the governor.
Sponsors
Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] |
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0826) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 24, PNV 4 |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0993) |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0645) |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2538 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.