TN HB2186 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the Voluntary Pre-K for Tennessee Act of 2005; requires, instead of authorizes, an LEA to provide a pre-kindergarten program that is open to any child who is four years of age on or before August 15 and who resides within the geographic area served by the LEA; removes the requirement for a community pre-k advisory council; requires this state to fund 100 percent of the costs required for an LEA to provide a pre-kindergarten program. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49, relative to pre-kindergarten education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2121 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee