TN HB2173 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that trial court judges and chancellors must file statements of interest. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 2; Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 55 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that trial court judges and chancellors must file statements of interest. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 2; Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 55 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | Ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2760 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020