TN HB2157 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a healthcare provider providing a vaccination to a minor to include in the minor's electronic medical record proof of prior parental or guardian informed consent. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to medical records.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2140 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee