TN HB2145 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 6/2/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 6/2/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to promulgate as a rule by means of cross-reference the manual relating to the child care certificate program and requires administrative hearings in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to promulgate as a rule by means of cross-reference the manual relating to the child care certificate program and requires administrative hearings in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-05-05 | Rec. for Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR for 03/17/2010 | |
2009-05-19 | Re-referred To: Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources--Government Operations for review | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2132 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-13 - Failed In S.GW,H&HR Comm. Ayes 2, Nays 3 PNV 3
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2145&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2145.pdf |