TN HB2138 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants a reimbursement of 100 percent of local property taxes paid by any veteran determined to be 100 percent permanently and totally unemployable from a service-connected disability; grants a reimbursement of 50 percent of property taxes paid by any veteran who has a permanent and total service-connected disability and income less than $30,000. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, grants a reimbursement of 100 percent of local property taxes paid by any veteran determined to be 100 percent permanently and totally unemployable from a service-connected disability; grants a reimbursement of 50 percent of property taxes paid by any veteran who has a permanent and total service-connected disability and income less than $30,000. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. |
2016-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1717 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-08 - Placed on Senate St. & Local Govt. Vet. Affairs Subcommittee calendar for 3/14/2016
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2138&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2138.pdf |