TN HB2130 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies the powers that the state funding board may exercise with respect to the local government investment pool, including establishing limits, restrictions, or conditions on the acceptance of moneys into and the withdrawal of moneys from the fund and other various powers; makes other related revisions to the administration of the local government investment pool. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, relative to the local government investment pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 824 | |
2022-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2122 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 824