TN HB2127 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on the segments of State Route 62 and U.S. Highway 27 in Morgan County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Title
As introduced, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on the segments of State Route 62 and U.S. Highway 27 in Morgan County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2270 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Failed in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee / no motion