TN HB2122 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee rapid growth school district fund from which capital improvement grants are to be awarded in fiscal year 2020-2021 to LEAs experiencing rapidly growing student populations. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee rapid growth school district fund from which capital improvement grants are to be awarded in fiscal year 2020-2021 to LEAs experiencing rapidly growing student populations. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Failed in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2370 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee