TN HB2116 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of revenue to, on a monthly basis, compile and transmit to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of both houses, in addition to the appropriate licensing board or agency, a list of taxpayers who are delinquent 90 days or more from the due date of the professional privilege tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of revenue to, on a monthly basis, compile and transmit to the chairs of the finance, ways and means committees of both houses, in addition to the appropriate licensing board or agency, a list of taxpayers who are delinquent 90 days or more from the due date of the professional privilege tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2279 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation