TN HB2109 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a four-year pilot program in the dual enrollment grant program to determine if covering more fully the costs of dual enrollment courses increases participation in the program and subsequent success in college. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, creates a four-year pilot program in the dual enrollment grant program to determine if covering more fully the costs of dual enrollment courses increases participation in the program and subsequent success in college. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2235 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-10 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2109&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2109.pdf |